RI H5624 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows state employees the ability to make an after tax contribution to a qualified Roth contribution program as a part of a deferred compensation plan.
Title
Deferred Compensation Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5624.pdf |