RI H5626 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Awards all pension system members 3% COLA applied to first $50,000 of retirement allowance annually exp. 1/1/20 provided prior year investment return gains 10% or more until fund is 80% funded.
Title
Retirement System - Contributions And Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5626.pdf |