RI H5629 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides additional controls on state spending by enhancing reporting requirements and penalties and restricting over expenditures.
Title
Relating To Public Finance
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5629.pdf |