RI H5636 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Would, through the office of management and budget, implement the Lean government initiative and include a mandatory yearly progress report by departments, agencies, boards and commissions.
Title
Lean Government Initiative Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing (06/04/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5636.pdf |