RI H5650 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides specific language for signs to be posted at certain establishments notifying people of contact information to the national human trafficking resource center.
Title
Trafficking Of Persons And Involuntary Servitude
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Rep. George Nardone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5650.pdf |