RI H5666 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that applicants/licensees for fossil fuel electricity generating facilities invest in renewable energy facilities in conjunction with the fossil fuel facility construction.
Title
Energy Facility Siting Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2019) |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/07/2019) |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5666.pdf |