RI H5668 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits solid waste landfill facilities and municipal waste management facilities from being located closer than one mile from any residential neighborhood in any city or town.
Title
Refuse Disposal
Sponsors
Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5668.pdf |