RI H5669 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires schools to comply with recycling and composting laws and promotes food donation and local food service contracts.
Title
School Waste Recycling And Refuse Disposal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5669.pdf |