RI H5670 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effect And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council (crmc)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effect And Procedures For The Reorganization Of The Rhode Island Coastal Resources Management Council (crmc)
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5670.pdf |