RI H5671 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Plastic Waste Reduction Act" to reduce the use of plastic bags, offer recyclable bags and provides penalties for violations. Effective one year from promulgation or January 1, 2021, whichever occurs first.
Title
Plastic Waste Reduction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-05 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5671.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5671A.pdf |