RI H5672 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the required air quality monitoring program at T.F. Green International Airport for two years to July 31, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Permanent Air Quality Monitoring Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-05-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/23/2019)
2019-05-08HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-05-03HouseScheduled for consideration (05/08/2019)
2019-05-03HouseProposed Substitute
2019-04-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-22HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019)
2019-03-08HouseCommittee transferred to House H.E.W.
2019-02-27HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback