RI H5677 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts natural hair braiders from the requirement to be licensed as hairdressers or cosmeticians, and would define the practice of natural hair braiding.
Title
Barbers, Hairdressers, Cosmeticians, Manicurists And Estheticians
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2019-04-10 | House | House read and passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |