RI H5688 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a process for insurers who wish to utilize receivership rather than the other processes of liquidation or rehabilitation.
Title
Insurer Receivership Model Act
Sponsors
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Moira Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5688.pdf |