RI H5689 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Deceptive Trade Practices Act to clarify the law's exemptions, enable individuals subject to unfair or deceptive acts/practices to recover increased damages/permit the attorney general to seek civil penalties for initial violations of the law.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions - Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5689.pdf |