RI H5692 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any public utility or its contractor to reimburse an excavator for lost time expense incurred, including manpower and equipment from the utilities incorrect marking of underground utilities.
Title
Excavation Near Underground Utility Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5692.pdf |