RI H5700 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows voters to file state form designating party affiliation rather than in person and change affiliation within 30 days prior to primary election with local canvassing board.
Title
Registration Of Voters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |