RI H5701 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the effective date of Chapters 157 and 259 of the 2018 Public Laws from July 1, 2019 to July 1, 2020 in regards to Chapter 11-37.1 ("Sexual Offender Registration and Community Notification").
Title
Sexual Offender Registration And Community Notification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-05-07 | House | House read and passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2019) |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |