RI H5709 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amends several election statutes to require votes received by declared write-in candidates to be reported, requires a declaration to be filed by candidates to be elected by write-in and considers ballots cast for no office to be "irregular ballots".
Title
Nomination Of Party And Independent Candidates
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - As amended (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - As amended (Y: 48 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-06-27 | Senate | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | House voted to reconsider |
2019-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |