RI H5714 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a voter may use proof of identity which expired no more than six (6) months prior to voting.
Title
Conduct Of Election And Voting Equipment, And Supplies
Sponsors
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |