RI H5737 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the installation of video surveillance cameras and equipment in any classroom which has an enrolled child with a disability, who as a result of such disability is unable to communicate.
Title
Children With Disabilities [see Title 16 Chapter 97 - The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5737.pdf |