RI H5744 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the rules and regulations pertaining to the unauthorized practice of law committee would be approved and promulgated by the supreme court.
Title
Law Practice
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5744.pdf |