RI H5750 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends certain campaign contribution and expenditure reporting requirements and would provide for forfeiture of campaign contributions upon a conviction or plea of nolo contendere to specified felony crimes relating to public office.
Title
Theft, Embezzlement, False Pretenses, And Misappropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Jose Serodio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5750.pdf |