RI H5753 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assigns financial responsibility for late filings of campaign finance reports to treasurer of committees and authorizes board of elections to institute civil action or refer matter to attorney general and authorizes candidates name kept off the ballot.
Title
Rhode Island Campaign Contributions And Expenditures Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5753.pdf |