RI H5758 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows voters making a mark rather than signature to vote with proof of identity by affirming their mark to the electronic pollbook without need for an affidavit by election supervisors.
Title
Conduct Of Election And Voting Equipment, And Supplies
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |