RI H5764 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Moves the date of primaries to the eighth Tuesday preceding biennial state elections.
Title
Nomination - Declaration Of Candidacy - Primary Votes
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Mario Mendez [D] |
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-07 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |