RI H5765 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that polls in all cities and towns except New Shoreham open at 7 am and provides time for receipt of ballots cast outside the US.
Title
Elective Meetings
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |