RI H5772 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Amaral & Associates Real Estate, Inc.
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Amaral & Associates Real Estate, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-05-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/28/2019) |
2019-04-23 | House | House read and passed |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/23/2019) |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/19/2019) |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019) |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |