RI H5784 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the department of health to establish an inspection and evaluation program and establish rules and regulations regarding air quality in elementary and secondary schools.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5784.pdf |