RI H5787 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that law enforcement officers issue only warnings of the risks to persons leaving a child under the age of seven (7) unattended in a motor vehicle.
Title
Children -- Confinement In Motor Vehicles Prohibited
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5787.pdf |