RI H5816 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Meeting postponed (06/24/2019)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-24 - Meeting postponed (06/24/2019)
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits clinical laboratories as defined in ยง 23-16.2-2(2) to conduct its own analysis of specimens for the detection of HIV/AIDS instead of sending the specimens to the department of health.
Title
Prevention And Suppression Of Contagious Diseases - Hiv/aids
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | House | Meeting postponed (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5816.pdf |