RI H5822 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a custody procedure for pets in divorce and separation proceedings based on the best interests of the animal.
Title
Divorce And Separation
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/09/2019) |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5822.pdf |