RI H5853 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island Early Childhood Innovation Act and funds to support programs designed to narrow the education achievement gap for at-risk children who are entering kindergarten.
Title
The Rhode Island Early Childhood Innovation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5853.pdf |