RI H5859 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any reimposition of car/trailer excise tax subsequent to fiscal year 2024 phase-out shall provide a uniform statewide tax rate for use by cities and towns.
Title
Motor Vehicle And Trailer Excise Tax Elimination Act Of 1998
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Jose Serodio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2019) |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5859.pdf |