RI H5867 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires annual reports to track the number of caregiver assessments given as part of the assessments conducted for Medicaid long-term services and supports the creation of a family caregiver support association by the division of elderly affairs.
Title
Personal Care Attendant Program
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |