RI H5877 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Helps expedite the payments made to subcontractors for work they perform on state contracts. It would also establish a new process to help minority business enterprises collect for their work on state contracts from their prime contractors.
Title
Prompt Payment By Department Of Administration--subcontractor Payments
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-03-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5877.pdf |