RI H5884 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - House voted to recommit to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - House voted to recommit to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a person twenty-one (21) years of age or older may purchase or possess a stun gun, and makes it a felony to use a stun gun in certain circumstances.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | House voted to recommit to House Judiciary |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended |
2019-06-23 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |