RI H5919 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Rhode Island Student Success Act" which would identify those students who are exempt from paying nonresident tuition at public universities, colleges or community colleges.
Title
Council On Postsecondary Education [see Title 16 Chapter 97 - The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act]
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/10/2019) |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5919.pdf |