RI H5920 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The "out Of School Time Learning Commission" (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The "out Of School Time Learning Commission" From May 15, 2019, To January 28, 2020, And Said Commission Would Expire On March 28, 2020.)
Title
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The "out Of School Time Learning Commission" (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The "out Of School Time Learning Commission" From May 15, 2019, To January 28, 2020, And Said Commission Would Expire On March 28, 2020.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5920.pdf |