RI H5922 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides medical insurance policies to provide coverage for communication access services for the hard-of-hearing.
Title
Communication Access
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5922.pdf |