RI H5946 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PLAT 90 LOT 23) AND TO ISSUE NOT MORE THAN $7,500,000 BONDS AND NOTES THEREFOR (Authorizes the town of North Kingstown to issue not more than seven million five hundred dollars ($7,500,000) in bonds and notes to finance improvements and/or related equipment for the town hall.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of North Kingstown To Finance Construction, Renovations, Demolition, Remediation, Alterations, Additions And Other Improvements And/or Related Equipment For The Town Hall At 80 Boston Neck Road And At Memorial Park
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2019-05-14 | House | House read and passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/14/2019) |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2019) |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |