RI H5965 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals (bhddh) To Fully Address All Previous Violations And Take All Necessary Actions To Ensure Ongoing Compliance With The Federal Mental Health Parity And Addiction Equity Act Of 2008
Title
House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals (bhddh) To Fully Address All Previous Violations And Take All Necessary Actions To Ensure Ongoing Compliance With The Federal Mental Health Parity And Addiction Equity Act Of 2008
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-04-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5965.pdf |