RI H5976 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an emergency management director emeritus license plate for Thomas F. Senerchia of West Warwick.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles--emergency Management Director Emeritus
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5976.pdf |