RI H5986 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Refuse Disposal (would Require Private Contractors Who Pick Up Trash And Recyclable Materials To Place The Empty Container In A Safe And Orderly Manner In The Pick Up Area. Any Violation Of This Section Would Subject The Person Or Entity To A Fine Of $100 Per Incident.)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Refuse Disposal (would Require Private Contractors Who Pick Up Trash And Recyclable Materials To Place The Empty Container In A Safe And Orderly Manner In The Pick Up Area. Any Violation Of This Section Would Subject The Person Or Entity To A Fine Of $100 Per Incident.)
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-04-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5986.pdf |