RI H5986 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits condominium bylaws or management committees from instituting any rule or regulation that would prohibit attaching religious objects to the front door of a condominium unit.
Title
Condominium Ownership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2015-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2015-05-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2015) |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |