RI H5987 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminalizes accessing the user account of another person without consent for the purpose of viewing or using information maintained on any electronic database, website or account with each instance constituting a separate offense.
Title
Computer Crime
Sponsors
Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5987.pdf |