RI H5988 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names the intersection of Hartford Avenue and Reservoir Avenue in the town of Johnston as "The Bernard 'Bernie' Frezza, Jr. Junction."
Title
Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices And Other State Constructions
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Mario Mendez [D] |
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2019-06-12 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2019) |
2019-06-06 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |