RI H5989 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a contractor or builder to hire a qualified third-party inspector or state inspector to perform an inspection if a building official fails to perform an inspection within forty-eight (48) hours after notification, excluding weekends/holidays.
Title
State Building Code - New Buildings And Structures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-10 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |