RI H5992 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Behavioral Health And Firearms Safety Task Force To Review, And Make Recommendations For, Statutes Relating To Firearms And Behavioral Health Issues
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Behavioral Health And Firearms Safety Task Force To Review, And Make Recommendations For, Statutes Relating To Firearms And Behavioral Health Issues
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Peter Martin [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013) |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2013) |
2013-04-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5992.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5992A.pdf |