RI H5993 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the town of East Greenwich to adopt a flexible tiered tax classification system regardless of whether it is a revaluation or update year and also to provide an exemption to small businesses for tangible personal property taxes.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2019-05-09 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2019) |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-04-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |