RI H6006 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating The Rhode Island Public Health Study Commission
Title
House Resolution Creating The Rhode Island Public Health Study Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. Larry Valencia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | House read and passed | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-27 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-30 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H6006.pdf |